This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 02:12:52 (UTC).

AGHAKHANI, SAMANEH VS SAEIDIFARD, SAEID

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 AGHAKHANI, SAMANEH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAEIDIFARD, SAEID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0361

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGHAKHANI SAMANEH

Respondent

SAEIDIFARD SAEID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OKHOVAT AIDIN

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

3/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/11/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/11/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/11/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/11/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/11/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

3/11/2021: Summons

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/7/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/28/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 04/28/21

9/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 04/28/21

Request - Enter Default FL165

9/28/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Judgment

10/21/2021: Judgment

Declaration - Default FL170

10/21/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 04/28/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKHOVAT AIDIN