This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2023 at 12:25:58 (UTC).

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NELSON JAVIER DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NELSON JAVIER DIAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1582

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BTB PARTNERS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DIAZ AN INDIVIDUAL NELSON JAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSTA JOSEPH P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/28/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summary of the Case

1/12/2023: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant); BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company; Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual; On the Complaint filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company on 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company on 09/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, does 1-25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAddress for Joseph P Costa (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joseph P Costa (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company; On the Complaint filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company on 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/28/2022; Service Cost: 115.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/27/2022; Service Cost: 115.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Helen Zukin in Department 207 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant); BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant); BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Javier Diaz, an individual (Defendant); BTB PARTNERS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less