This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 06:22:26 (UTC).

AFFELD GRIVAKES LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS CASTELLANI DAVID, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 AFFELD GRIVAKES LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against CASTELLANI DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4392

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AFFELD GRIVAKES LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

ANTHEM INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS ANTHEM HEALTH INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

DAVID CASTELLANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBINSON DAMION D

AFFELD DAVID WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

11/23/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

10/21/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT); Filed by Castellani David (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE); Filed by Castellani David (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Anthem, Inc. Which Will Do Business in California as Anthem Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Anthem, Inc. Which Will Do Business in California as Anthem Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Affeld Grivakes LLP, a limited liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Affeld Grivakes LLP, a limited liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Affeld Grivakes LLP, a limited liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFFELD GRIVAKES LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Anthem, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE