This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 15:01:54 (UTC).

AFAKORI, INC. DBA., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ICON WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 AFAKORI, INC DBA , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ICON WEST, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0512

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

AFAKORI INC DBA AAF STEEL STRUCTURAL

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY A WISCONSIN CORPORATION

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

Defendants

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

ICON WEST INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

ICON WEST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RUDMAN BRUCE

Cross Defendant Attorney

SALAMIRAD ALI

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 472

11/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 472

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

11/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER

11/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/15/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Request for Judicial Notice

11/10/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/10/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN A. GELZAYD, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANYS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN A. GELZAYD, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANYS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/10/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSSCOMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSSCOMPLAINT

Joint Status Conference Report

11/2/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Joint Status Conference Report

11/2/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/20/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/19/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/19/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling

10/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/15/2022: Case Management Statement

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Plaintiff's Failure to Obtain New Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Filing First Amended Cross-Complaint Pursuant to CCP section 472; Filed by: Icon West, INC., (Cross-Complainant); As to: Afakori, Inc, (Cross-Defendant); OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Lauren Stec (Attorney); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Justin A. Gelzayd, Esq. in Support of Old Republic Surety Company's Demurrer to the Second Cause of Action of Icon West, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint: Name Extension changed from OF JUSTIN A. GELZAYD, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANYS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSS-COMPLAINT to of Justin A. Gelzayd, Esq. in Support of Old Republic Surety Company's Demurrer to the Second Cause of Action of Icon West, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Lodging in Support of Cross-Defendant Old Republic Surety Company's Demurrer and Demurrer to the Second Cause of Action of Icon West, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint: Name Extension changed from IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION OF ICON WEST, INC.S CROSSCOMPLAINT to in Support of Cross-Defendant Old Republic Surety Company's Demurrer and Demurrer to the Second Cause of Action of Icon West, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, Continuance of Case Management Conference, and Continuance of Demurrer; Filed by: Afakori, Inc, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Plaintiff's Failure to Obtain New Counsel scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ICON WEST, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/15/2022; Service Cost: 75.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ICON WEST, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ICON WEST, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AFAKORI, INC. dba., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ICON WEST, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0512 Hearing Date: November 15, 2022 Dept: P

Tentative RulingAfakori dba AAF Steel Structural v. Icon West, Inc. et al. Case no. *******0512Hearing Date November 15, 2022 Plaintiff’s Counsel’s Motion to be Relieved

Attorney Colin K. McCarthy moves to be relieved as counsel for plaintiff/cross-defendant Afakori, Inc. Counsel filed and properly served the required judicial council forms—MC050, MC051 and MC052. The next substantive hearing is a demurrer on December 8, 2022. If the motion is granted, it is unlikely Afakori will be able to secure replacement counsel to defend a demurrer, possibly causing prejudice. Counsel moves to withdraw due to an alleged breakdown in the attorney-client relationship, specifying “repeated emails have gone unanswered,” and “client has failed to adhere to the advice of counsel.” Declaration in support of attorney’s motion to be relieved, pg 1. This is a sufficient basis to grant the motion. To avoid undue prejudice, the hearing date for the demurrer may be continued at Afakori’s request. GRANTED.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFAKORI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ICON WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant