This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 03:41:29 (UTC).

AEMETIS, INC. VS. TRINITY CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 AEMETIS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against TRINITY CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2083

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AEMETIS INC.

Respondent

TRINITY CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JOHNSON K CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Other -

1/29/2018: Other -

Application

1/29/2018: Application

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Aemetis, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Other - (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location); Filed by Aemetis, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aemetis, Inc. is a litigant