This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2022 at 08:15:42 (UTC).

ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE VS MORENO, ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against MORENO, ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE

Respondent

MORENO ENRIQUE

Others

DEL CASTILLO VICTORIA

ELWELL CARLIE

GUTIERREZ SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorneys

COLLINS KATHERINE A.

KACHMAR ALEX JAMES JR

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/20/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Notice - Notice of Court Hearing

1/20/2022: Notice - Notice of Court Hearing

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/20/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

1/20/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence) - Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

1/20/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence) - Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing

1/20/2022: Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - WV-110 Temporary Restraining Order

1/20/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - WV-110 Temporary Restraining Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet with addendum

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet with addendum

Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

2/9/2022: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/9/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (WV-110 Temporary Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Case Cover Sheet with addendum ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Court Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence) (Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less