This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 06:52:03 (UTC).

ADRIENNE RUSSELL VS ACHARMU CROSBY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ADRIENNE RUSSELL against ACHARMU CROSBY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2854

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RUSSELL ADRIENNE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 25

CROSBY ACHARMU

RICH-CROSBY DEBRA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/5/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES) 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

2/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES) 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Adrienne Russell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGES) 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692854    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Igor Fradkin, Esq. seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Adrienne Russell on grounds that there has been a breakdown in attorney-client communication. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) However, this motion, declaration, and proposed order must be served on the client by personal service, electronic service, or mail. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(d).) Counsel did not file a proof of service showing service on Plaintiff.

Accordingly, this Motion to be relieved is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.

Case Number: BC692854    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Igor Fradkin, Esq. seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Adrienne Russell on grounds that there has been a breakdown in attorney-client communication. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)

The motion, declaration, and proposed order must be served on the client either by personal service, electronic service, or mail. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(d).) The proof of service filed on January 6, 2020 states counsel had the motions papers served by substitute service, which is not one of the methods acceptable under Rule 3.1362(d). Furthermore, it conflicts with Item 3(a) on the attorney declaration, which states that the attorney personally served the client. Also, the order and declaration do not identify the OSCs scheduled on March 5, 2020 and February 5, 2021.

Accordingly, this Motion to be relieved is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.