This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 11:07:31 (UTC).

ADRIENNE MARISA JONES VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 ADRIENNE MARISA JONES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2818

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES ADRIENNE MARISA

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LONG BEACH BMW MINI A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

LONG BEACH BMW MINI

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NITA M. NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorneys

HOM BRIAN MING

HOM BRIAN M.

Other Attorneys

NITA NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

4/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Substitution of Attorney

2/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/24/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action, with prejudice); Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Counsel); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); SAI Long Beach B, Inc., dba Long Beach BMW Erroneously Sued As Long Beach BMW Mini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by SAI Long Beach B, Inc., dba Long Beach BMW Erroneously Sued As Long Beach BMW Mini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer (- Defendant SAI Long Beach B, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint); Filed by SAI Long Beach B, Inc., dba Long Beach BMW Erroneously Sued As Long Beach BMW Mini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer (- Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Adrienne Marisa Jones' Complaint For Damages); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint (For Damages); Filed by Adrienne Marisa Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NITA NICHOLAS