This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 12:35:10 (UTC).

ADRIENNE LARGE VS DIANE M. MAY

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 ADRIENNE LARGE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DIANE M MAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, RUTH ANN KWAN and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1826

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

RUTH ANN KWAN

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LARGE ADRIENNE

Defendants and Respondents

DECLERQ WILLIAM

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

MAY DIANA M.

DECLERCQ ESQ. WILLIAM B.

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CULPEPPER THADDEUS J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B.

DECLERCQ LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

2/27/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

2/27/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

2/27/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

3/1/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

3/6/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/4/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

FRIST AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/30/2018: FRIST AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

6/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Diana M. May (Defendant); William B. DeClercq, Esq. (Defendant); WILLIAM DECLERQ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Diana M. May (Defendant); William B. DeClercq, Esq. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...) of 12/20/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketOrder (Court's Tentative Ruling Re: Motion for sanctions against attorney Thaddeus J. Culpepper, Esq.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA S AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE AND FRAUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adrienne Large (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CULPEPPER THADDEUS J.