This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 06:23:07 (UTC).

ADRIANE NOLAN VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 ADRIANE NOLAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9281

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOLAN ADRIANE

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRERA PATRICIO T.D. ESQ.

CARR MICHAEL T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

NOVELL CARINA L

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/16/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/6/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/6/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

5/6/2022: Answer

Answer

5/6/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/29/2022: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant); THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS (Defendant); THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adriane Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant