Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 06:19:18 (UTC).

ADRIANA PATRICIA GONZALEZ AGUILAR, ET AL. VS HECTOR MANUEL BENITEZ, JR

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 ADRIANA PATRICIA GONZALEZ AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HECTOR MANUEL BENITEZ, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2717

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAREDES DALEYZA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADRIANA GONZALEZ

GONZALEZ AGUILAR ADRIANA PATRICIA

Defendants

BENITEZ HECTOR MANUEL JR

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DALEYZA

4/2/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DALEYZA

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/7/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/13/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adriana Patricia Gonzalez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Daleyza Paredes, a Minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Adriana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Adriana Patricia Gonzalez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Daleyza Paredes, a Minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Adriana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adriana Patricia Gonzalez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Daleyza Paredes, a Minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Adriana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Daleyza); Filed by Adriana Patricia Gonzalez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Daleyza Paredes, a Minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Adriana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adriana Patricia Gonzalez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Daleyza Paredes, a Minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Adriana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC (USA), INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES BRADLEY G