This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:31:44 (UTC).

ADRIANA NAVARRO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 ADRIANA NAVARRO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1298

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAVARRO AN INDIVIDUAL ADRIANA

NAVARRO ADRIANA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

LETOFSKY BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

7/19/2022: Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

7/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

7/22/2022: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adriana Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adriana Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adriana Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adriana Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETOFSKY BRIAN SAMUEL