This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:01:02 (UTC).

ADRIANA CARMONA VS GRACIE-ANN E DINKINS MD

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by ADRIANA CARMONA against GRACIE-ANN E DINKINS MD in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9349

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CARMONA ADRIANA

Defendants and Respondents

DINKINS GRACIE-ANN E.

DOES 1 TO 20

 

Court Documents

PROOOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Request for Judicial Notice

11/2/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/2/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Other -

11/2/2018: Other -

Other -

11/2/2018: Other -

Notice

12/10/2018: Notice

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/17/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

DEFENDANT, GRACIE-ANN E. DINKINS, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: DEFENDANT, GRACIE-ANN E. DINKINS, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

1/10/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DICAL MALPRACTICE [C.C. 1714, 3333, 33332]

1/10/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DICAL MALPRACTICE [C.C. 1714, 3333, 33332]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Adriana Carmona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Notice (Of Taking Motion For Summary Judgment Of Defendant); Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Notice of Motion and Summary Judgment Motion of Defendant Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins, M.D.; Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Appendix 2 of 2 of Exhibits in Support of Summary Judgment Motion; Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Appendix 1 of 2 of Exhibits in Support of Summary Judgment Motion; Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Evidence in Support of Summary Judgment Motion of Defendant Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins, M.D.; Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Gracie-Ann E. Dinkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DEFENDANT, GRACIE-ANN E. DINKINS, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adriana Carmona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DICAL MALPRACTICE [C.C. 1714, 3333, 33332]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Adriana Carmona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689349    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On January 9, 2018, plaintiff Adriana Carmona filed this action against defendant Gracie-Ann Dinkins, M.D. for medical malpractice. The parties wish to continue trial from January 10, 2020 to September 11, 2020 and all discovery and motion cutoff dates to be based on the new trial date. A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

The parties seek a continuance because Plaintiff needs another surgery, is still waiting for surgical authorization, and the parties need time to determine Plaintiff’s current condition and alleged injuries/damages. The Court finds good cause for a continuance. Trial is set for September 11, 2020. The Final Status Conference is set for August 28, 2020. All motion and discovery cut off dates are to be based on the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.