This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:59:32 (UTC).

ADRIAN SALDIVAR, ET AL VS. FERREIRA CARMELO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ADRIAN SALDIVAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FERREIRA CARMELO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6319

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELASQUEZ CONSTRUCTOR SERVICES INC.

SALDIVAR ADRIAN

VELASQUEZ RAMIRO

Defendants

DOES 1-10

CARMELO FERREIRA

DELWARTE TAMMY

SALIH HENRY

RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES INC.

RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES INC

Other and Not Classified By Court

VELASQUEZ PAINTING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN ESQ. HAYK

Defendant Attorneys

KALE MICHAEL ALAN

SCHWARTZ GARY NEAL

 

Court Documents

Notice

7/2/2018: Notice

Order

7/19/2018: Order

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

8/3/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

9/13/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department U; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing On Demurrer; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Tammy Delwarte (Defendant); Re/Max Olson & Associates, Inc.-DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Re/Max Olson & Associates, Inc.-DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Re/Max Olson & Associates, Inc.-DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); RAMIRO VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Adrian Saldivar (Plaintiff); Velasquez Constructor Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RE/MAX OLSON & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIGORYAN HAYK M.