This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:13:54 (UTC).

ADRIAN PEREZ VS NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 ADRIAN PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6854

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ ADRIAN

Defendant

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIXON MATTHEW LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant Attorney

SKEBBA ISAAC & BUECHLER

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

7/3/2018: Case Management Statement

Complaint

7/5/2018: Complaint

Case Management Statement

7/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/9/2018: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ADRIAN PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and MSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • at 01:30 pm in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial and MSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ADRIAN PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons; Filed by ADRIAN PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by ADRIAN PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMARK TRANSPORTATION is a litigant