This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2022 at 10:31:41 (UTC).

ADRIAN MACHADO-MARTINEZ VS SAMUEL SANGWOO KIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 ADRIAN MACHADO-MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMUEL SANGWOO KIM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6619

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACHADO-MARTINEZ ADRIAN

Defendants

KIM SAMUEL SANGWOO

RAISER LLC

RAISER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARIAN ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/2/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adrian Machado-Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adrian Machado-Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adrian Machado-Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARIAN, ALEXANDER M