This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2023 at 10:19:19 (UTC).

ADRIAN HERNANDEZ VS BRADLEY J DEGEORGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 ADRIAN HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRADLEY J DEGEORGE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA R. JASKOL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9166

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA R. JASKOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ADRIAN

Defendants

DEGEORGE BRADLEY J

COAST ALUMINUM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAGHIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

CASTALDI GIUSEPPE

MARTINEZ JORGE A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS BRADLEY J. DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM, INC.'S EX ...)

6/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS BRADLEY J. DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM, INC.'S EX ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING O...)

6/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING O...)

Proof of Service by Mail

6/7/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BRADLEY DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND R

6/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BRADLEY DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND R

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BRADLEY DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELA

6/7/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BRADLEY DEGEORGE AND COAST ALUMINUM TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELA

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/6/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

6/6/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Association of Attorney

4/25/2023: Association of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/1/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/5/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/22/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Demand for Jury Trial

2/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/6/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2024
  • Hearing05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • Hearing09/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application of Defendants Bradley DeGeorge and Coast Aluminum to Advance Date for Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial or, In the Alternative, to Continue Trial and Related Dates: Filed By: Coast Aluminum, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Defendants Bradley J. DeGeorge and Coast Aluminum, Inc.'s Ex ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial or, In the Alternative, to Continue Trial and Related Dates scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/13/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Adrian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Bradley J DeGeorge (Defendant); Coast Aluminum, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Adrian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Bradley J DeGeorge (Defendant); Coast Aluminum, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Adrian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Bradley J DeGeorge (Defendant); Coast Aluminum, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less