This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 00:10:28 (UTC).

ADRIAN GLUCK VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 ADRIAN GLUCK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2100

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLUCK ADRIAN

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

SHUGART JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

4/13/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/13/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement ((conditional)); Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adrian Gluck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUGART JONATHAN