Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 06:28:11 (UTC).

ADONIS KISH VS ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 ADONIS KISH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1674

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADONIS KISH

Defendants

FRESH LEAF LLC

LUNSFORD MORLAN H.

ERSHADI SHOREH

ANTIAGING INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

ADVANTAGE INSTITUTE OF HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORENFELD DAVID KEITH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • Hearing08/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ADONIS KISH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ADONIS KISH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ADONIS KISH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORENFELD DAVID K.