This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 01:42:44 (UTC).

ADNAN EL SABBAGH, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 ADNAN EL SABBAGH, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0324

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EL SABBAGH ADNAN

EL SABBAGH TALA

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EL SABBAGH ZEINAB ABDULLAH

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT MARA E.J.

Defendant Attorney

DIXON ESQ DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

6/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/31/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

9/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/20/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Related Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/30/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/30/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/30/2021

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/7/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/01/2022 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/31/2022 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 04/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/30/2022 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Adnan El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); Tala El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); Zeinab Abdullah El Sabbagh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Adnan El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); Tala El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Adnan El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); Tala El Sabbagh (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less