This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 01:14:39 (UTC).

ADNAN ALBAITONY VS LEIBL MIRETSKY & MOSELY LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 ADNAN ALBAITONY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against LEIBL MIRETSKY MOSELY LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4085

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALBAITONY ADNAN

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MOSELY KATHERYN S.M.

LEIBL MIRETSKY & MOSELY LLP

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARTORELL LAW APC

DUKE DAVID WILLIAM

ROBINSON RAYMOND GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

BODENSTEIN JANETTE SHARON

ZOKAEIM DANA

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MOULIN LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

5/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

Case Management Statement

5/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/26/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

3/11/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

2/28/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer to plaintiffs 'First Amended Complaint

2/28/2019: Answer - Answer to plaintiffs 'First Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement

3/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/15/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/17/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice - Notice Of Association Of Counsel

11/30/2018: Notice - Notice Of Association Of Counsel

Substitution of Attorney

11/6/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/16/2018: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

7/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Leibl, Miretsky & Mosely, LLP (Defendant); Katheryn S.M. Mosely (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adnan Albaitony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL APPLICATION DATE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES); Filed by Leibl, Miretsky & Mosely, LLP (Defendant); Katheryn S.M. Mosely (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (to Continue Trial) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date); Filed by Leibl, Miretsky & Mosely, LLP (Defendant); Katheryn S.M. Mosely (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Eduardo Law Martorell (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE LIEN (ATTACHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adnan Albaitony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOULIN LEE MICHAEL