This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 07:01:08 (UTC).

ADLINE ONYENWE VS L.A. DOWNTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 ADLINE ONYENWE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against L A DOWNTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1995

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONYENWE ADLINE

Defendants

L.A. DOWNTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC A CORPORATION

SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBIN STEVEN MARK

Defendant Attorney

BERTIKIAN MARIANNA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/5/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ADLINE ONYENWE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/24/2019: Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ADLINE ONYENWE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/23/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

8/7/2019: Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

11/7/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order); Filed by L.A. Downtown Medical Center LLC, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by L.A. Downtown Medical Center LLC, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer (AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ADLINE ONYENWE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT); Filed by L.A. Downtown Medical Center LLC, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adline Onyenwe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUCCESS HEALTHCARE 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. DOWNTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN STEVEN M.