This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2019 at 03:54:54 (UTC).

ADLI LAW GROUP P C VS ELKIN SIEGERT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 ADLI LAW GROUP P C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELKIN SIEGERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1608

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ADLI LAW GROUP P.C.

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

SIEGERT VERA

POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC.

CASTELLANOS VERA

SIEGERT ELKIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL N. BERKE

BERKE MICHAEL NORMAN

Defendant Attorney

ZIMMERMAN KURT FREDRIC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/21/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Trial Brief

8/21/2019: Trial Brief

Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

8/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/6/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Answer -

10/11/2018: Answer -

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/5/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/17/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

10/18/2018: Case Management Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

10/18/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/17/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Bankruptcy Filing); Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Non-Service - Other; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adli Law Group, P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADLI LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant