This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 15:12:56 (UTC).

ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3453

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERVANTES AN INDIVIDUAL ADILENY

Defendants

US VI DOWNEY LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC A VIRGINIA CORPORATION

ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC A COLORADO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/8/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/5/2019: Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: ADRIEL

8/8/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: ADRIEL

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARTURO

7/5/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARTURO

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/2/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal (not entered): Name Extension: (not entered); As To Parties changed from US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant), ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION (Defendant), T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION (Defendant) to ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION (Defendant), US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant), T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, et al. on 07/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES, and ARTURO DAMIAN SANCHEZ CERVANTES as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, et al. on 07/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES, and ARTURO DAMIAN SANCHEZ CERVANTES as to ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION, T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION, and US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); ARTURO DAMIAN SANCHEZ CERVANTES (Plaintiff); ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES (Plaintiff); As to: US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION (Defendant); T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Ariel - Rejected; Submitted by: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from SANCHEZ CERVANTES, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADILENY CERVANT to SANCHEZ CERVANTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); ARTURO DAMIAN SANCHEZ CERVANTES, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADILENY CERVANTE (Plaintiff); ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADILENY CERVANT (Plaintiff); As to: US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION (Defendant); T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ADILENY CERVANTES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); ARTURO DAMIAN SANCHEZ CERVANTES, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADILENY CERVANTE (Plaintiff); ADRIEL SIXTO SANCHEZ CERVANTES, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADILENY CERVANT (Plaintiff); As to: US VI DOWNEY, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC, A COLORADO CORPORATION (Defendant); T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A VIRGINIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Ariel: Status Date changed from 08/08/2019 to 07/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Arturo: Status Date changed from 08/06/2019 to 07/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less