This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2019 at 00:28:14 (UTC).

ADILENE PONCE VS CHILDRENS HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ADILENE PONCE against CHILDRENS HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3666

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1 TO 100

Guardian Ad Litem

PONCE FABIOLA

Minor

PONCE ADILENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BLESSEY RAYMOND L. ESQ

Minor Attorney

DENOVE JOHN F. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

DAN MICHAEL A K

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE: DISMISSAL

11/6/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Notice of Settlement

5/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

5/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/14/2019

5/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/14/2019

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE

6/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE

Proof of Service -

6/21/2018: Proof of Service -

DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES' (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES' (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/13/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

2/28/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

SUMMONS -

3/12/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

2/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Hearing02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Continue OSC Re: Dismissal); Filed by Adilene Ponce (Legacy Party); Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of OSC re Dismissal of Settled Case); Filed by Fabiola Ponce (Legacy Party); Adilene Ponce (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 2:43 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Fabiola Ponce (Legacy Party); Adilene Ponce (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 05/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fabiola Ponce (Legacy Party); Adilene Ponce (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Fabiola Ponce (Legacy Party); Adilene Ponce (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693666    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

ADILENE PONCE,

Plaintiff,

v.

CHILDREN’S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693666

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Fabiola Ponce (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Adilene Ponce (“Claimant”). The Court finds the settlement to be fair and reasonable. The Court approves the deductions for costs, as they are directly related to the litigation. The Court approves the requested attorneys’ fees, as they are fair and appropriate, given the nature of the case and the services performed.

The Court finds that this case would be suitable for a special needs trust. Specifically, the Court finds that Claimant has a disability that substantially impairs her ability to provide for her own care or custody, which constitutes a substantial hardship. The Court finds that Claimant is likely to have special needs that will not be met without the trust. However, given the amount at issue ($36,297.67), a special needs trust would not be effective, as a large percentage of the money would be consumed by hiring an attorney to set up the trust and hiring a bank to administer the trust.

Therefore, the Court approves Petitioner’s request to distribute the funds from the attorney’s trust account to any licensed automobile dealership for the purchase of a vehicle/van in order to transport Claimant. The Court finds that this is an appropriate use of the funds because the vehicle/van will be used to transport Claimant.

The Court also approves Petitioner’s request to distribute funds from the attorney’s trust account to any licensed business to purchase and/or install a lift on the vehicle, if necessary. The Court finds that this is an appropriate use of the funds because the vehicle/van will be used to transport Claimant.

The van shall not be titled in the name of Claimant Adilene Ponce. The van may be titled in the name of her mother, Petitioner Fabiola Ponce. Petitioner shall be responsible for repairs, insurance, and gas.

The Court sets an OSC re: Expenditure of Funds and Dismissal for ________, 2020. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: March 5, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court