This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 18:31:28 (UTC).

ADERIYIKE LAWAL VS SERGIO ROSSI USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 ADERIYIKE LAWAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SERGIO ROSSI USA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8263

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWAL ADERIYIKE

Defendant

SERGIO ROSSI USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUZARI AZAR

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Aderiyike Lawal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aderiyike Lawal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aderiyike Lawal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aderiyike Lawal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aderiyike Lawal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOUZARI AZAR ESQ.