This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 16:08:11 (UTC).

ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3720

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAVICENCIO AN INDIVIDUAL ADELITA

Defendant

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION AKA EL SUPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/31/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/31/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/31/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/31/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2025
  • Hearing01/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ADELITA VILLAVICENCIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.