This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 14:56:52 (UTC).

ADELE R SYLVESTER VS GABRIELLA Z. CASTILLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ADELE R SYLVESTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIELLA Z CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7789

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYLVESTER ADELE R

Defendants

CASTILLO GABRIELLA Z.

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMBERG DAVID J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2024
  • Hearing10/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adele R Sylvester (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adele R Sylvester (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adele R Sylvester (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMBERG DAVID J.