This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:29:44 (UTC).

ADELA MURRILLO DE NOLASCO VS CITY OF LYNWOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 ADELA MURRILLO DE NOLASCO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LYNWOOD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4858

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURRILLO DE NOLASCO ADELA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CITY OF LYNWOOD

EBS GENERAL ENGINEERING INC.

EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING INC.

INTERSTATE STRIPING & SIGNS INC.

SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOKOZIAN BRUCE

Defendant Attorneys

DUNKIN CRAIG L.

COLVIN ROGER ALLEN

TRINH KATIE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GLINKA PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

5/6/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/6/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/29/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)

5/3/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)

Answer

4/8/2022: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/14/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/14/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/24/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/4/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/4/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2025
  • Hearing02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)); Filed by City of Lynwood (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Interstate Striping & Signs Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Adela Murrillo De Nolasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adela Murrillo De Nolasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adela Murrillo De Nolasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adela Murrillo De Nolasco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less