This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 04:32:29 (UTC).

ADELA CALDERON VS LOS ANGELES APPAREL, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 ADELA CALDERON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOS ANGELES APPAREL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5008

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDERON ADELA

Defendant

LOS ANGELES APPAREL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

DE SARIO JAMES A.

NOURMAND MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

VEGLIA ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

6/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Case Management Order

5/23/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; RULING ON PLAINTIFF BRAYAN BAUTIST...)

5/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; RULING ON PLAINTIFF BRAYAN BAUTIST...)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

5/23/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Case Management Order

5/23/2022: Case Management Order

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/23/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

5/16/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Initial Status Conference Order

4/12/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Initial Status Conference Order

4/12/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

4/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Initial Status Conference Order

12/20/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

12/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/20/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/20/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

3/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

3/29/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

3/30/2022: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability); Filed by Los Angeles Apparel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Filing and Service- Case Anywhere); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference; Ruling on Plaintiff Brayan Bautist...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Report; Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 12/20/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Adela Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VEGLIA ALICIA