This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 07:25:44 (UTC).

ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE, ET AL. VS RAYMOND EASTWOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAYMOND EASTWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0709

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PINMILOYE ADEKUNLE

PINMILOYE OLUBUNMI

Defendants

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

EASTWOOD RAYMOND DBA TRUSTEE OF THE EASTWOOD TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN IGHEGHA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/6/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUWASEYITAN PINMILOYE, (SUING BY HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUWASEYITAN PINMILOYE, (SUING BY HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUWASEYITAN PINMILOYE, (SUING BY HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ADEKUNLE PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE (Plaintiff); OLUWASEYITAN PINMILOYE, (SUING BY HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, OLUBUNMI PINMILOYE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN I