This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 08:35:37 (UTC).

ADDY, HOLLY - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 ADDY, HOLLY - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2038

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FOREST LAWN MORTUARY

Not Classified By Court

ADDY HOLLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVIDSON JANE

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Order - Order for Release of Remains

3/4/2020: Ex Parte - Order - Order for Release of Remains

Ex Parte - Application - Petition For Court Order To Release Remains Of A Decedent

3/2/2020: Ex Parte - Application - Petition For Court Order To Release Remains Of A Decedent

Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Ex Parte Order For Release Of Remains Of A Decedent

3/2/2020: Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Ex Parte Order For Release Of Remains Of A Decedent

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Order (Order for Release of Remains ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Petition For Court Order To Release Remains Of A Decedent ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREST LAWN MORTUARY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON JANE