This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 06:30:42 (UTC).

ADAN CUEVA ET AL VS RICKY NOH ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 ADAN CUEVA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RICKY NOH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5964

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

C&H SPORTSWEAR INC

CUEVA ADAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

SILLA AMERICA INC

LEE SUNG K.

MC CREW LTD

S.K. MACHINERY MOVING INC

PARK SOON GIL

DBDE INC

NOH RICKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.

BIGGINS DOUGLAS CHADWICK ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ECOFF LAWRENCE C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

3/16/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT SUNG K. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT SUNG K. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

11/5/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

12/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/26/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ADVANCED HEARING ON DEFENDANT SUNG K. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF ADVANCED HEARING ON DEFENDANT SUNG K. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

1/22/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT S.K. MACHINERY MOVING INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/4/2017: DEFENDANT S.K. MACHINERY MOVING INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF GINNI G. KIM RE: MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS PRIOR TO DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC GRANT OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO DEMURRER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 430.41

11/3/2017: DECLARATION OF GINNI G. KIM RE: MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS PRIOR TO DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC GRANT OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO DEMURRER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 430.41

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/20/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

9/14/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION

9/14/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ADAN CUEVA (Plaintiff); C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • at 4:29 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/21/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by ADAN CUEVA (Plaintiff); C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 55; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by ADAN CUEVA (Plaintiff); C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ADAN CUEVA (Plaintiff); C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Lawrence C. Ecoff, Esq. (SBN 143814) BHN b

Ginni G. Kim, Esq. (SBN 249515) Sgerler o uné%f%;,,,fam,a ECOFF CAMPAIN & TILLES, LLP Y of Los Angeles

A Limited Liability Partniership DE

280 South Beverly Drive, Suite 504 C 04 2017 Beverly Hills, California 90212 , Sherri B Carter, E

Telephone: (310) 887-1850 Juhve Officer/Clerk F_acsix.m'le: (310) 887-1855 W Deputy

E-mail: _ecoff({@ecofl] aw..com

Attorneys for Defendants RICKY NOH, SOON GIL PARK, SILLA AMERICA, INC., MC CREW, LTD., DBDE, INC., S.K. MACHINERY MOVING INC., and SUNG K. LEE

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES —- CENTRAL DISTRICT

ADAN CUEVA; C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC. | Case No.;: BC675964 BY %fik Plaintiffs; [Assigned for all purposes to Dept. 55, Hon., Judge Malcom H. Mackey, Presiding] V. . DEFENDANT S.K. MACHINERY MOVING RICKY NOH; SOON GIL PARK; SILLA INC.’S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AMERICA, INC.; MC CREW, LTD.; DBDE, INC.; S.K. MACHINERY MOVING, INC.; SUNG K. LEE and DOES 1-100,

Defendants.

COMES NOW Defendant S. K. MACHINERY MOVING, INC. “Defengiant”), in answer and response to the unverified Complaint (“Complaint”) of Plaintiffs ADAN CUEVA and C & H SPORTSWEAR, INC. (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), on behalf of itself, and no other defendants, hereby admuts, denies, and alleges as follows: |

1. In accordance with Code of Civil Procedure §431.30(d), this answering Defendant denies, both generally and specifically, each and every allegation set forth in the Complaint, and without limiting the generality of the foregoing, deny that Plaintiffs are entitled to the damages alleged, if any, or at all, or in any amount whatsoever, or such equitable relief as sought, if any, or at all.

2. Further answering the Complaint, and the whole thereof, including each and every