This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 01:39:11 (UTC).

ADAM DE VORE ET AL VS RIKKIA MARIE SYKE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 ADAM DE VORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIKKIA MARIE SYKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3011

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

DE VORE ADAM

DE VORE HEATHER

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 10

SYKE RIKKIA MARIE

Minor and Not Classified By Court

DE VORE SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

DE VORE MICHAEL J.

DEVORE MICHAEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

10/5/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FO...)

10/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE;

9/24/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE;

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/2/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/8/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute the Case) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 2:34 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Adam De Vore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Adam De Vore (Plaintiff); Heather De Vore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE VORE MICHAEL J.