This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 02:46:03 (UTC).

ADA GUEVARA VS RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 ADA GUEVARA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4887

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA ADA

Defendants

GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC.

RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MEHTANI AANAND

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK D. KEMPLE ON BEHALF OF RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED RE: INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41(A)(2), 435.5(A)(2) AND RESULTING

1/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK D. KEMPLE ON BEHALF OF RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED RE: INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41(A)(2), 435.5(A)(2) AND RESULTING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING STAY PENDING MEDIATION AND ARBITRATION; AND PROPOSED ORDER

1/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING STAY PENDING MEDIATION AND ARBITRATION; AND PROPOSED ORDER

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ada Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation Regarding Stay Pending Mediation and Arbitration; and Proposed Order); Filed by RBD California Restaurants Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ada Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MARK D. KEMPLE ON BEHALF OF RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED RE: INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41(a)(2), 435.5(a)(2) AND RESULTING 30 DAY EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT); Filed by RBD California Restaurants Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ada Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ada Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ada Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEHTANI AANAND