Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 15:35:34 (UTC).

ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. VS SERGIO MORENO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SERGIO MORENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY MOHR and MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3134

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANTHONY MOHR

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC.

FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC.

LEE MICHAEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ASE INVESTMENTS LLC

FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC.

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

MORENO SERGIO AKA SERGIO MORENO MORALES AKA SERGIO MORENO MORALES

ASE INVESTMENTS SOLUTIONS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

VEDOY'S FIRE AND SAFETY COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MACCARLEY MARK

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CASTORINA BRYAN

HOWARD ELMIRA R.

MACCARLEY MARK

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

3/5/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/29/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Motion for Sanctions

2/4/2021: Motion for Sanctions

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER RE CONTINUANCES

6/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER RE CONTINUANCES

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/27/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

3/3/2020: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER

2/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

2/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

2/3/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketReply (PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY, AND TERMINATING SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC.?S WILLFUL FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT?S DISCOVERY ORDERS DATED DECEMBER 1, 2020, AND); Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Bryan Castorina Re: Erroneous Discovery Responses Served on Acosta Enterprises and Attached To the Opposition To Motion For Sanctions); Filed by FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY AND TERMINATING SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF BRYAN CASTORINA); Filed by FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Notice Re Continuance Of Hearing); Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docketat 12:00 PM in Department 96; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV43134    Hearing Date: March 05, 2021    Dept: 54


Case Number: 20STCV07026    Hearing Date: March 05, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Certified Healthcare Billing Services, Inc.,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

20STCV07026

vs.

Ruling

Complete Care Family Medical Clinic, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: March 5, 2021

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Demurrer to Cross-Complaint and Motion to Strike

Moving Party: Cross-Defendants Certified Healthcare Billing Services, Inc. and Gevork Oganyan

Responding Party: Cross-Complainants Complete Care Family Medical Clinic, Healing Hand Family Care Clinics Corp. and Homayoun Siman, APC dba Stat Urgent and Primary Care

T/R: THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE ARE MOOT AND TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS TO NOTICE.

CCP § 472(a) provides, in pertinent part, “[a] party may amend its pleading once without leave of the court at any time before the answer, demurrer, or motion to strike is filed, or after a demurrer or motion to strike is filed but before the demurrer or motion to strike is heard if the amended pleading is filed and served no later than the date for filing an opposition to the demurrer or motion to strike.”  

Cross-Complainants filed a First Amended Cross-Complaint on February 22, 2021, nine court days before the continued March 5, 2021 hearing date for this demurrer and motion to strike. Cross-Defendants objected to this filing as untimely, arguing that the FACC must have been filed nine court days before the original hearing date of January 21, 2021.

CCP § 472(a) does not distinguish between original hearing dates and continued ones. It states that it must be served no later than the date for filing an opposition. The Court finds the FACC timely. The demurrer and motion to strike are moot and taken off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD ELMIRA