Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 00:09:17 (UTC).

ACOSTA ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 ACOSTA ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2662

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondent

FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MACCARLEY MARK

Respondent Attorney

EISER JUSTIN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTIES FROM MECHANICS LIENS

1/4/2021: Order - ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTIES FROM MECHANICS LIENS

Order - RULING

12/30/2020: Order - RULING

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

12/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING AFTER EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET HEARING OF PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING AFTER EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET HEARING OF PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

11/30/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/3/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/20/2020

11/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/20/2020

Notice of Ruling

11/3/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE HEARING DATE ON PETITION TO RELEASE MECHANICS LIEN; DECLARATION OF MARK MACCARLEY

10/28/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE HEARING DATE ON PETITION TO RELEASE MECHANICS LIEN; DECLARATION OF MARK MACCARLEY

Order - ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIENS

10/28/2020: Order - ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIENS

Notice of Related Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/28/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

8/25/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • Hearing02/05/2021 at 09:15 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder (For Release of Properties from Mechanics Liens); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Expunging Mechanic's Lien) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Expunging Mechanic's Lien)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRuling; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOrder (re: Ex Parte Application); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Setting Hearing Date on Petition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Dat...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF HEARING AFTER EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET HEARING OF PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Shorten Time to Hear Petition to Release Property From Liens); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (Shortening Time to Hear Petition for Release of Property from Liens); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOpposition (Respondent Fremont Cabinet Imports, Inc.'s Opposition to Ex Parte Application); Filed by Fremont Cabinets Imports, Inc., a California corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN); Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPetition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien; Filed by Acosta Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACOSTA ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACCARLEY MARK