This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2022 at 14:34:58 (UTC).

ABUNDIO ARREDONDO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 ABUNDIO ARREDONDO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE SPIRITS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3640

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARREDONDO AN INDIVIDUAL ABUNDIO

Defendants

SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THOMAS AN INDIVIDUAL TIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LAMAR KARIMAH J.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/29/2022: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

12/1/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Tim Thomas, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Tim Thomas, an individual (Defendant); As to: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2022; Service Cost: 109.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Tim Thomas, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/02/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Tim Thomas, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Tim Thomas, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Abundio Arredondo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert S. Draper in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less