This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2021 at 14:54:28 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE USA, INC. VS HARMAN PROFESSIONAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 ABSOLUTE USA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARMAN PROFESSIONAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7918

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE USA INC.

Defendants

SCHOEN MICHAEL A.

HARMAN PROFESSIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HARMAN PROFESSIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSHAN-ZAMIR PERRY

Defendant Attorney

ASHBY JOSEPH R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/9/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CMC)*)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CMC)*)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CMC)*) OF 09/29/2021

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CMC)*) OF 09/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE...)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Pursuant to LASC Local Rule 3.22) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to LASC Local Rule...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference ((CMC)*) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference (CMC)*)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference (CMC)*) of 09/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Harman Professional, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Absolute USA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Absolute USA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Absolute USA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Absolute USA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARMAN PROFESSIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABSOLUTE USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHBY JOSEPH R.