This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:55:03 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC VS HYOUNG Y WEE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HYOUNG Y WEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7666

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

WEE HYOUNG Y

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

WEE HYOUNG Y.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VOS RYAN E. ESQ.

VOS RYAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown

5/14/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/29/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/27/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/5/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/27/2019: Unknown

Declaration

3/12/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/12/2019: Declaration

Unknown

3/12/2019: Unknown

Order

3/12/2019: Order

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

DECLARATION OF VENUE

12/20/2017: DECLARATION OF VENUE

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Declaration (Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals); Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 03/12/2019 entered for Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC against Defendant Hyoung Y. Wee, an individual.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Declaration (in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)); Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Order (Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals); Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FILED

or Court of Califo nty of L_o% ,Aj_naeles

‘SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - UNLIMITED BC687666

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, Case No. LLC, Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR: VS. 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

| 2. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT HYOUNG Y WEE, an individual;

and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive.

Defendant. DEMAND: $31,697.50

FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned, ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC, and successor in interest to original creditor, WebBank.

2. Plaintiff 1s the only entity that purchased the debt after charge-off and its name and address i1s as follows: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC; 8000 Norman Center Dr. Suite 860, Bloomington MN 55437.

3. Plaintiff is a debt buyer, and is the sole owner of the debt at issue.

4. The charge-off creditor at the time of charge-off is WebBank, 215 SOUTH STATE STREETSUITE 800, SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84111, and the account number associated with this debt 1s XX2952.

5. Plaintiff is informed and believes that Defendant are individuals who currently reside

within the jurisdictional boundaries of the above entitled Court. Therefore, this Court is the