This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 02:09:14 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC VS ANDRANIK PATURIAN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDRANIK PATURIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

PATURIAN ANDRANIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TSAI KIMBERLEE RAE

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

3/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tsai, Kimberlee Rae