This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 20:26:01 (UTC).

ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF CERRITOS, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF CERRITOS, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN AN INDIVIDUAL ABROM

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF CERRITOS A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN ESQ IGOR

Defendant Attorneys

WIMER HARVEY W III

BACIO GARY A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/4/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/4/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/4/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/4/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

5/12/2022: Answer

Answer

5/11/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-NAME OF DEFENDANT BEING DISMISSED DOESN'T MATCH OUR RECORDS

6/6/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-NAME OF DEFENDANT BEING DISMISSED DOESN'T MATCH OUR RECORDS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2025
  • Hearing04/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (filed not entered-name of defendant being dismissed doesn't match our records); Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF CERRITOS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ABROM MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF CERRITOS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR