This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:17:20 (UTC).

ABRAMOWITZ, SANDRA DELORES - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 ABRAMOWITZ, SANDRA DELORES - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0330

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHARP FRANKIE

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Decedent

ABRAMOWITZ SANDRA DELORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WERNER TROY ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

9/15/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Proof of Publication

10/6/2017: Proof of Publication

Will - Admitted - Will filed under safekeeping# 17STSK02243 at Stanley Mosk Court

10/26/2017: Will - Admitted - Will filed under safekeeping# 17STSK02243 at Stanley Mosk Court

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

10/26/2017: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

10/27/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Probate - Appointing Executor w/ Full Authority

11/13/2017: Order - Probate - Appointing Executor w/ Full Authority

Letters (Initial) - of Testamentary w/ Full Authority

11/28/2017: Letters (Initial) - of Testamentary w/ Full Authority

Notice - Administration (PC 9202)

12/11/2017: Notice - Administration (PC 9202)

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

2/9/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Account - Final or Waiver

8/7/2018: Account - Final or Waiver

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust

8/8/2018: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust

Receipt - Distribution - Receipt for Special Gift Distribution to Daniel Abramowitz

8/13/2018: Receipt - Distribution - Receipt for Special Gift Distribution to Daniel Abramowitz

Minute Order

10/18/2018: Minute Order

Declaration - Verified Supplemental Declaration of Frankie Sharp re Probate Notes

10/22/2018: Declaration - Verified Supplemental Declaration of Frankie Sharp re Probate Notes

Order - Final Distribution

10/30/2018: Order - Final Distribution

Receipt - Distribution - Receipt of Final Distribution to Betty J Sharp

11/28/2018: Receipt - Distribution - Receipt of Final Distribution to Betty J Sharp

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

3/11/2019: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt - Distribution (Receipt of Final Distribution to Betty J Sharp ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt - Distribution (Receipt of Final Distribution to Frankie Sharp ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Order - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Declaration (Verified Supplemental Declaration of Frankie Sharp re Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • in Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Receipt - Distribution (Receipt for Special Gift Distribution to Daniel Abramowitz ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Account - Final or Waiver; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • in Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Will (Admitted - Will filed under safekeeping# 17STSK02243 at Stanley Mosk Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Declaration (of Frankie Sharp re Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less