This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 02:57:17 (UTC).

ABRAM BADALYAN VS CITY OF BURBANK

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 ABRAM BADALYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BURBANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4020

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BADALYAN ABRAM

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF BURBANK

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY ET AL.

PAVECO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Not Classified By Court

BURBANK CITY ATTORNEY OFFICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOURJIAN NAREG

DRUCKER BARRY ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

ALBANO AMELIA ANN

FREEDMAN SCOTT

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

5/31/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/14/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint

3/14/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/14/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ORDER RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

1/29/2019: Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ORDER RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint

1/24/2019: Amended Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

1/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/28/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

11/26/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Association of Attorney

11/14/2018: Association of Attorney

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/7/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/7/2018: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Hearing05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Hearing04/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by City of Burbank (Cross-Complainant); PAVECO CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Burbank (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by City of Burbank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Burbank (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Burbank (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Burbank (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff); Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint or Alternatively for Motion to Strike the First and Second Causes of Action in the Complaint; Filed by City of Burbank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Nareg Gourjian (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abram Badalyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BURBANK PARAMEDIC SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN