This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR., AN INDIVIDUAL VS PARTICLE MEDIA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR , AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PARTICLE MEDIA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5459

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ JR. AN INDIVIDUAL ABELARDO

Defendant

PARTICLE MEDIA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 04/15/2021

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 04/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

4/13/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

6/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

6/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Hearing on Order to Show Cause re Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 04/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARTICLE MEDIA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT