This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 08:27:41 (UTC).

ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR., AN INDIVIDUAL VS FRESH, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR , AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FRESH, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6756

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ JR. AN INDIVIDUAL ABELARDO

Defendant

FRESH INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESH INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT