This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 05:09:59 (UTC).

ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR., AN INDIVIDUAL VS BALLARD DESIGNS, INC., A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR , AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BALLARD DESIGNS, INC , A GEORGIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2801

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ JR. AN INDIVIDUAL ABELARDO

Defendant

BALLARD DESIGNS INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH OF PARTY

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH OF PARTY

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COURT NOTICE RE COURTESY COPIES AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCES

7/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COURT NOTICE RE COURTESY COPIES AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCES

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

9/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/13/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

9/10/2021: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Management Conference and Court Notice Re Courtesy Copies and Informal Discovery Conferences); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Death of Party); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ballard Designs, Inc., a Georgia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG