This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 14:12:32 (UTC).

ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR., AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS GARNET HILL, INC., A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 ABELARDO MARTINEZ, JR , AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GARNET HILL, INC , A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2799

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ JR. AN INDIVIDUAL ABELARDO

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

Defendant

GARNET HILL INC. A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEATH OF PARTY

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEATH OF PARTY

Case Management Statement

8/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

8/6/2021: Case Management Order

Request for Dismissal

11/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Garnet Hill, Inc., a New Hampshire corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Death of Party); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Garnet Hill, Inc., a New Hampshire corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abelardo Martinez, Jr., an individual (Plaintiff); Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG