This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 00:02:26 (UTC).

ABEL OJEDA RODRIGUEZ VS BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. (A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 ABEL OJEDA RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1008

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ ABEL OJEDA

Defendants

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

Defendant Attorney

COOPER ROBERT S

 

Court Documents

Complaint COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [Unlimited Jurisdiction, more than $ 25,000.00] 1. Violation of Government Code 512940(a) [Disparate Treatment of Physical Disability] 2. Violation of Government Code 512940(h) [Retaliation]...

10/21/2022: Complaint COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [Unlimited Jurisdiction, more than $ 25,000.00] 1. Violation of Government Code 512940(a) [Disparate Treatment of Physical Disability] 2. Violation of Government Code 512940(h) [Retaliation]...

Summons Summons on Complaint

10/21/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/26/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/6/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 02/21/2023

2/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 02/21/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

2/21/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

 

Docket Entries

08/14/2024

Hearing08/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2024

Hearing08/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketJury Trial (7 days) scheduled for 08/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 02/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 02/21/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 02/21/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
01/06/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Abel Ojeda Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); Service Date: 01/06/2023; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Abel Ojeda Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [Unlimited Jurisdiction, more than $ 25,000.00] 1. Violation of Government Code 512940(a) [Disparate Treatment of Physical Disability] 2. Violation of Government Code 512940(h) [Retaliation]... Filed by: Abel Ojeda Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); DOES 1-50 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Abel Ojeda Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less