This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2017 at 08:13:02 (UTC).

EMMANUEL OLIVEIRA VS BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 EMMANUEL OLIVEIRA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0845

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALVARADO ABEL MARTINEZ

OLIVEIRA EMMANUEL

Defendants and Respondents

FCA US LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MIKHOV STEVEN B. ESQ.

ROSE ADAM M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CONSTANTINO TRACY WEI ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/31/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

10/17/2017: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

PLAINTIFF EMMMANUEL OLIVEIRA?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL YOUNG OFF CALENDAR

10/13/2017: PLAINTIFF EMMMANUEL OLIVEIRA?S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL YOUNG OFF CALENDAR

COMPLAINT 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATION ETC

5/10/2017: COMPLAINT 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATION ETC

SUMMONS

5/10/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

6/19/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF BRITTANY M. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS.

7/31/2017: DECLARATION OF BRITTANY M. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS.

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

7/31/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

7/31/2017: DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

7/31/2017: DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF EMMMANUEL OLIVEIRA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL YOUNG, EMPLOYEE OF DEFENDANT BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES, INC.; ETC.

9/14/2017: PLAINTIFF EMMMANUEL OLIVEIRA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL YOUNG, EMPLOYEE OF DEFENDANT BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES, INC.; ETC.

Minute Order

9/26/2017: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration (IN SUPP OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Notice (of taking motion to compel depo of michael young off calendar ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Motion to Compel (DEPO OF MICHAEL YOUNG, EMPLOYEE OF DEFENDANT BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES, INC. REQUEST FOR SANCTIO NS OF $3120.; MEMO OF P'S AND A'S DECL OF ADAM ROSE; PROPOSED ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Points and Authorities (in support of motion t compel arbitration and stay proceedings, or, in the alternative, to transfe r venue and request for sanctions ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Motion to Compel (arbitration and stay proceedings or in the alternative, to transfer venue and request for sanctions ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Declaration (of brittany m hernandez in support of motion to compel arb ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Declaration (of g abriela marin in support of motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings, or, in the alternative, to transfer venue ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt ( beach cities protective services, inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONSTANTINO, TRACY W.